Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis Cardinal de Bourbon de Vendôme (II)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Laon

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Administrator of Sens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1493BornChâteau de Ham en Picardie
24 Apr 151017.3AppointedBishop of Laon, France
3 May 151724.3Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
1 Jul 151724.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151724.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
8 Aug 151926.6AppointedAdministrator of Le Mans, France
11 Jun 152128.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
11 Jan 152431.0AppointedAdministrator of Luçon, France
27 Mar 152734.2ResignedAdministrator of Luçon, France
3 Mar 153340.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
13 Aug 153542.6AppointedAdministrator of Sens, France
14 Jun 153845.4AppointedAdministrator of Tréguier, France
26 Apr 154249.3ResignedAdministrator of Tréguier, France
24 Feb 155057.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
23 Mar 155259.2ResignedBishop of Laon, France
13 Mar 155764.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Laon, France

MicroData Summary for Louis de Bourbon de Vendôme (II):
Cardinal Louis de Bourbon de Vendôme (II) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Laon

  • a bishop for 39.9 years
  • a cardinal for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 298, and Page 162

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013