Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedetto Cardinal de Accolti

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1497BornFlorence
24 Jul 152123.7AppointedAdministrator of Cádiz, Spain
16 Mar 152325.3AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
17 Aug 152426.8AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
21 Dec 152427.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
3 May 152729.5Elevated to Cardinal
5 May 152729.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
24 Jan 153032.2AppointedAdministrator of Bovino, Italy
6 Feb 153133.2AppointedAdministrator of Policastro, Italy
15 Apr 153537.4ResignedAdministrator of Bovino, Italy
5 Jul 153537.6ResignedAdministrator of Policastro, Italy
21 Sep 154951.8DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto de Accolti:
Benedetto Cardinal de Accolti (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

  • a bishop for 24.7 years
  • a cardinal for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,092
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 May 1527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283, and Page 181
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 200
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,884
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 40, Number 192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015