Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Baptiste-François (Odo) Cardinal Pitra, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archive

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1812Born
13 Dec 183624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Autun, France
15 Jan 184229.4EnteredPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Feb 184330.5Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Mar 186350.6Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 186350.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
22 Feb 186754.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
19 Jan 186956.4AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
19 Jan 186956.4AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archive
12 May 187966.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
1 Jun 187966.8Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
24 Mar 188471.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
9 Feb 188976.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-François (Odo) Pitra (VIAF: 68934374)
Jean-Baptiste-François (Odo) Cardinal Pitra O.S.B. (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChampforgeuil, Diocese of Autun, France
Ordained PriestAutun, Diocese of Autun, France
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceS. Callisto, Convent, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Propaganda Fide Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
  • a cardinal for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 44, and Page 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 47, and Page 53
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 28
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Mar 1863
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 17 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Sep 2021

Quantcast