Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompeo Piccolomini de Aragona

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jan 1556AppointedBishop of Lanciano, Italy
26 Jan 1560AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
3 May 1562DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pompeo Piccolomini de Aragona
Bishop Pompeo Piccolomini de Aragona (died ) Bishop of Tropea

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 320, and Page 218
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 13*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast