Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Albrici Pellegrini

Deceased

Bishop of Como


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1711BornComo
5 Oct 175140.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria
12 Mar 175241.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria
21 Jul 176049.4AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
5 Aug 176453.4DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Albrici Pellegrini:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Albrici Pellegrini (born , died ) Bishop of Como

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 176, and Page 209
  • ob/c2: CB, 1 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,586

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013