Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Maurizio Peiretti

Deceased

Bishop of Tortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1730Born
28 Dec 175525.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 178353.0AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
20 Jul 178353.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
18 Feb 179362.6DiedBishop of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maurizio Peiretti
Bishop Carlo Maurizio Peiretti (born , died ) Bishop of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaluzzo

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1791
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 194
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast