Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Ponce de Léon, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561¹Born
31 Aug 160544.6AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
30 Oct 160544.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
29 Mar 161049.2AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
1615²54.0ResignedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ponce de Léon
Bishop Pedro Ponce de Léon O.P. (born 1561) Bishop Emeritus of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba
Ordained BishopS. Estela, Convent, Salamanca, Diocese of Salamanca

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 120, Number 767
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 151, and Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 25
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,770
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast