Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josephus Antonius Chiolnich

Deceased

Bishop of Bosnia (Bosna)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1691³BornVivodinyi
30 Aug 172231.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 175160.3SelectedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
20 Mar 175261.0ConfirmedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
9 Jul 175261.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
17 Feb 177381.9DiedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josephus Antonius Chiolnich:
Bishop Josephus Antonius Chiolnich (born , died ) Bishop of Bosnia (Bosna)

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015