Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sancho de Andrade de Figueroa

Deceased

Bishop of Quito, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹Born
1661²29.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 167947.4AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
14 Apr 168048.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
15 Nov 168856.8AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
1702²70.0DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sancho de Andrade de Figueroa
Bishop Sancho de Andrade de Figueroa (born 1632, died 1702) Bishop of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 220, Number 1,365
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast