Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín de Híjar y Mendoza, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1627Born
1649²21.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
13 Apr 169365.7AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
1694¹66.4Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
20 Dec 169568.3InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
15 May 170476.7DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín de Híjar y Mendoza
Bishop Martín de Híjar y Mendoza O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Peru

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 40
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast