Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Dedoni

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Dec 1557AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
5 May 1560Ordained BishopBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
21 Aug 1561³DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Dedoni
Bishop Gerardo Dedoni (died ) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oristano, Archdiocese of Oristano

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 324
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,558, Number 1*
  • ob/c2+: AT, 22 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast