Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Thomās de Taxaquet

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1558AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
6 May 1560Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
1572²DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Thomās de Taxaquet
Bishop Francisco Thomās de Taxaquet (died 1572) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMallorca, Diocese of Mallorca, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oristano, Archdiocese of Oristano

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1,500, Page 68, Number 396
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 107
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,558, Number 13*
  • ob/c2+: AT, 22 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast