Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Palma

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1695Born
4 Mar 173034.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 174347.4AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
10 Feb 174347.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
31 Oct 176166.1DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Palma
Archbishop Giuseppe Palma (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1751
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast