Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melcior Palau i BoscÓ

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Apr 1664SelectedBishop of Urgell, Spain
23 Jun 1664ConfirmedBishop of Urgell, Spain
24 Sep 1664Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
29 Apr 1670DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Melcior Palau i BoscÓ:
Bishop Melcior Palau i BoscÓ (died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,032
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 354
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 399
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 198, Number 1,241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013