Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bl. Dermot O’Hurley

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530²Born
Sep 1581³51.6AppointedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
10 Sep 158151.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
20 Jun 158454.4DiedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
27 Sep 1992Beatified

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Dermot O’Hurley (VIAF: 315679303)
Archbishop Bl. Dermot O’Hurley (born 1530, died ) Archbishop of Cashel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEmly, Diocese of Emly
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,812
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 156
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 138
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 15 Nov 2017