Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Odescalchi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Penne e Atri, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1553²AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
15 Jun 1560AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
4 Sep 1561ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Dec 1566²AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
27 Feb 1568AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
Feb 1569³ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
1572¹ResignedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
1585²DiedBishop Emeritus of Penne e Atri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Odescalchi
Bishop Paolo Odescalchi (died 1585) Bishop Emeritus of Penne e Atri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComo, Diocese of Como

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 271
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 277
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 2*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast