Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspare Visconti

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1538²Born
5 Nov 158446.8AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
28 Nov 158446.9AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Dec 158446.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
12 Jan 159557.0DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Visconti (VIAF: 305115004)
Archbishop Gaspare Visconti (born 1538, died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSistine Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 22, Number 95
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 261, and Page 240
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016