Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch João Nunes Barreto, S.J. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Ethiopia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1519¹Born
1545²26.0ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
23 Jan 155536.0AppointedPatriarch of Ethiopia
5 May 155536.3Ordained BishopPatriarch of Ethiopia
22 Dec 156243.9DiedPatriarch of Ethiopia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Nunes Barreto (VIAF: 129762369)
Patriarch João Nunes Barreto S.J. (born 1519, died ) Patriarch of Ethiopia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto, Diocese of Porto, Portugal
Ordained BishopTrindade, Convent, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceGoa, Archdiocese of Goa, India

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1555, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 17 Oct 2017