Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Raggi, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1653Born
2 Mar 170551.5AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
8 Mar 170551.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
20 Sep 171259.0DiedBishop of Aleria, France

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Raggi
Bishop Raffaele Raggi B. (born , died ) Bishop of Aleria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 76
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast