Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Naamo

Deceased

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Chaldean), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1879Born
2 Mar 190222.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 193859.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Batnae
2 Apr 193959.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Batnae
28 Jun 195777.9AppointedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Chaldean), Lebanon
12 Feb 196484.6DiedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Chaldean), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Naamo
Bishop Gabriel Naamo (born , died ) Bishop of Beirut {Bairut}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossul

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast