Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bérenger Cardinal de Frédol (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1250¹BornLavérunne
1294²44.0AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
24 Oct 129444.8Ordained BishopBishop of Béziers, France
15 Dec 130556.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
15 Dec 130556.0Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1309²59.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
11 Jun 132373.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bérenger de Frédol (Sr.):
Cardinal Bérenger de Frédol (Sr.) (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a bishop for 28.6 years
  • a cardinal for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Dec 1305
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013