Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ceruelo Sanz

Deceased

Bishop of Menorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1759BornCorcos del Valle
30 May 182465.3SelectedBishop of Menorca, Spain
12 Jul 182465.4ConfirmedBishop of Menorca, Spain
3 Oct 182465.6Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
27 Oct 183071.7DiedBishop of Menorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ceruelo Sanz (VIAF: 316750443)
Bishop Antonio Ceruelo Sanz (born , died ) Bishop of Menorca

  • a bishop for 6.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,524
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 266
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 140, Number 760
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016