Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Antonio Resta

Deceased

Bishop of Andria, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Oct 1565AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
18 Nov 1565Ordained BishopBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
11 Aug 1578AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
27 Apr 1582AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
5 Oct 1597DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Antonio Resta (VIAF: 52034004)
Bishop Luca Antonio Resta (died ) Bishop of Andria

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 83
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 158, and Page 109
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 7, Number 3
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 21
  • ob: CB, 28 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast