Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Monterenzi

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Oct 1618AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
7 Oct 1618Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
23 May 1623DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Monterenzi:
Bishop Giulio Monterenzi (died ) Bishop of Faenza

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 185
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 64, Number 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015