Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimondo Moncada, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Patti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1736³BornSan Pietro di Monforte
31 May 176024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
23 Jan 178245.7SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
25 Feb 178245.8ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
3 Mar 178245.8Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
18 Sep 181377.4DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Moncada:
Bishop Raimondo Moncada C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 324
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 12 Oct 2013