Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gedeon Daszkiewicz Horbacki

Deceased

Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian)

Coadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1724¹BornMscislava
14 Dec 175329.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 176642.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
10 May 176945.3SucceededBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
21 May 1769³45.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
8 Oct 178157.7SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
10 Dec 178157.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
26 Jun 178460.4DiedBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Gedeon Daszkiewicz Horbacki:
Bishop Gedeon Daszkiewicz Horbacki (born 1724, died ) Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2015, 2, 13
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016