Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Mezon von Telz

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1576AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
15 Aug 1576Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
16 Feb 1578DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Mezon von Telz
Bishop Johann Mezon von Telz (died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBreslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 262
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,098
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast