Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ludovico Cardinal Merlini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1690BornForlž, Italy
27 Oct 174049.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
8 Dec 174050.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
24 Sep 175968.8Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jul 176069.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
12 Apr 176271.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
12 Nov 176272.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Merlini:
Ludovico Cardinal Merlini (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
  • a cardinal for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1740, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015