Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix Samuel Rodotà

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Beroë


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Sep 1735AppointedTitular Bishop of Beroë
13 Nov 1735Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Beroë
15 Oct 1740DiedTitular Bishop of Beroë

MicroData Summary for Felix Samuel Rodotà:
Bishop Felix Samuel Rodotà (died ) Titular Bishop of Beroë

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 121, and Page 455
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015