Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pasquale Maria Mastrilli, C.R. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1727BornNolan
1743¹15.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
20 Nov 176942.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
30 Nov 176942.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
18 Nov 178356.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Maria Mastrilli:
Archbishop Pasquale Maria Mastrilli C.R. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 303
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015