Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Massarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510¹Born
15 Dec 155747.9AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
21 Dec 155747.9Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
17 Jul 156656.5DiedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Massarelli (VIAF: 27296382)
Bishop Angelo Massarelli (born 1510, died ) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1557, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast