Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaus Pohmajevich

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1663³BornSenj
11 Apr 168925.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Apr 168925.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 171754.1SelectedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
6 Apr 171854.5ConfirmedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
10 Jul 171854.8Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
9 Feb 173066.4DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Pohmajevich:
Bishop Nicolaus Pohmajevich (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 350
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015