Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Marescotti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Strongoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1520²Born
18 Feb 158767.1AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
19 May 158767.3Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
24 Feb 159070.1DiedBishop of Strongoli, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claudio Marescotti
Bishop Claudio Marescotti O.S.B. (born 1520, died ) Bishop of Strongoli

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanto Spirito in Sassia, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 305
  • ob/c2+: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast