Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Marcilly

Deceased

Bishop of Autun, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Mar 1558AppointedBishop of Autun, France
9 Oct 1558Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
16 Aug 1572DiedBishop of Autun, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Marcilly
Bishop Pierre de Marcilly (died ) Bishop of Autun

EventPlace
Ordained Bishopla maison du Temple, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,340
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 96
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1558, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast