Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Marie de Mansi

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1694BornLongiano
2 Aug 174247.7AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
30 Sep 174348.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cavaillon, France
30 Oct 174349.0InstalledBishop of Cavaillon, France
28 Mar 175762.4AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
5 Nov 177480.0DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for François-Marie de Mansi:
Archbishop François-Marie de Mansi (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013