Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Mancini

Deceased

Bishop of Cittą della Pieve


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1719BornSonnino
25 Nov 174222.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 177555.4AppointedBishop of Cittą della Pieve, Italy
5 Jun 177555.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cittą della Pieve, Italy
17 Sep 179575.7RetiredBishop of Cittą della Pieve, Italy
179979.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Cittą della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Mancini:
Bishop Tommaso Mancini (born ) Bishop of Cittą della Pieve

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013