Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcantonio Cardinal Maffei

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Chieti

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1521BornBergamo
14 Jul 155331.6AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
14 Jan 156846.1ResignedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
17 May 157048.5Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 157048.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
22 Aug 158361.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Maffei:
Marcantonio Cardinal Maffei (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Chieti

  • a cardinal for 13.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 311

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014