Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardino Cardinal Maffei

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Chieti, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1514Born
22 Apr 154733.2AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
30 May 154733.3Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
8 Apr 154935.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 May 154935.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
7 Jun 154935.3AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
9 Nov 154935.7AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
14 Jul 155339.4ResignedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
16 Jul 155339.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Maffei (VIAF: 35213949)
Bernardino Cardinal Maffei (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Maffei Chapel, S. Maria sopra Minerva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
  • a cardinal for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Apr 1549
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 155, and Page 237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 311
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 10
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,545

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast