Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrogio Machin, O. de M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1576³BornAlghero
8 Dec 159821.9ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
15 Nov 162144.9AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
13 Jan 162245.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
18 Mar 162750.2SelectedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
20 Sep 162750.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
23 Oct 164063.8DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Machin:
Archbishop Ambrogio Machin O. de M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 78, and Page 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,021
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015