Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Gioacchino Lovera

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1738BornTorino
5 Jun 176224.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 178345.0SelectedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
18 Jul 178345.3ConfirmedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
20 Jul 178345.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
9 Nov 178345.7InstalledBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
11 Feb 179960.9DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Gioacchino Lovera
Bishop Giuseppe Gioacchino Lovera (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 364
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016