Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustyn Aleksander Łodziata

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655¹Born
31 Jul 168530.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
Sep 1685³30.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
4 Sep 168732.6SucceededBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
Jun 1691³36.4DiedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustyn Aleksander Łodziata
Bishop Augustyn Aleksander Łodziata (born 1655, died Jun 1691) Bishop of Chełm

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTorokan

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 302
  • ob/c2: ATh, 2 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017