Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Cayetano Loazes y Somoza

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1711³BornMondoñedo
5 Jun 176554.3AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
11 Aug 176554.5Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
17 Oct 176958.7DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Cayetano Loazes y Somoza:
Bishop José Cayetano Loazes y Somoza (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 83, Number 416
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015