Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de La Marthonie

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jul 1587AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
31 Jan 1588Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
7 Oct 1618DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Henri de La Marthonie
Bishop Henri de La Marthonie (died ) Bishop of Limoges

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAmiens, Diocese of Amiens

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 222
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast