Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Liparuli

Deceased

Bishop of Satriano e Campagna


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Apr 1624AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
21 Apr 1624Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
14 Dec 1637AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
1644¹DiedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Liparuli:
Bishop Alexander Liparuli Bishop of Satriano e Campagna

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 199, and Page 132
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 84, Number 501

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013