Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Lichtenau

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1444Born
148440.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
1 Apr 150561.2SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
7 May 150561.3ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
27 Jul 150561.5Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
12 Apr 151773.2DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Lichtenau (VIAF: 35272709)
Bishop Heinrich von Lichtenau (born 1444, died ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMindelheim
Ordained BishopDillingen

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,505, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast