Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Kerer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1431¹BornWertheim
1469¹38.0Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
5 May 149362.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
5 May 149362.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
8 May 149362.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
Sep 1506³75.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
24 Mar 150776.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Kerer:
Bishop Johann Kerer (died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,938
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013