Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Leonardis

Deceased

Bishop of Bisceglie


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1684BornCastel de Falchi
17 Dec 170723.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 173348.4AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
17 May 173348.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
15 Jul 173954.6AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
30 Apr 176277.4DiedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Leonardis:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Leonardis (born , died ) Bishop of Bisceglie

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1762
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013