Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Le Blanc

Deceased

Bishop of Vence, France

Bishop of Grasse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561¹Born
14 Feb 159231.1AppointedBishop of Vence, France
14 Feb 159231.1AppointedBishop of Grasse, France
31 May 159231.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vence, France
29 Nov 160140.9DiedBishop of Vence, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Le Blanc
Bishop Guillaume Le Blanc (born 1561, died ) Bishop of Vence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Nice, Diocese of Nice
Death PlaceAix en Provence

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 196, and Page 361
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 328, and Page 205
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast