Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Louis Pallavicino Ceva

Deceased

Bishop of Nice, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1537¹Born
17 Apr 158144.2AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
8 Aug 158346.6AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
7 Nov 158346.8AppointedBishop of Nice, France
5 Nov 159861.8DiedBishop of Nice, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Louis Pallavicino Ceva
Bishop Jean Louis Pallavicino Ceva (born 1537, died ) Bishop of Nice

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 290, and Page 236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 256
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast