Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthélémy Camelin

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹BornFréjus
1 Sep 159937.6AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
30 Jan 160038.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
15 Jun 163775.4DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Barthélémy Camelin:
Bishop Barthélémy Camelin (died ) Bishop of Fréjus

  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 3 Mar 2015